EP1172273 - Passenger transportation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senyo Kogyo Co., Ltd. 8-15, Motomachi 1-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka / JP | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Saburo 2-267, Hamaderashowa-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka / JP | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116627.9 | 12.07.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | JP20000213837 | 14.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000213837 | JP20000282893 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000282893 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1172273 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1172273 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B61B1/00 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
B61B1/00 (EP,US);
Y02T30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/03] | Title | German: | Fahrgasttransportsystem | [2002/03] | English: | Passenger transportation system | [2002/03] | French: | Système de transport de passager | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | CY | 12.07.2005 | IE | 12.07.2005 | LU | 12.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
CY | 12.07.2005 | ||
IE | 12.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 12.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 12.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 12.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3840224 (TEMPINSZKY MIKLOS [HU]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 28; figure 1 * [A] 4,7; | [A]WO9113662 (STEIN KARL STEPHAN [DE]) [A] 4,5,10 * page 5, line 34 - page 8, paragraph 3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0940313 (VON ROLL SEILBAHNEN AG [CH]) [A] 4,5,10* column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5957056 (BEHAR MARIO [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-4,8-10 *; | [A]WO0012350 (THAU BARBARA [DE], et al) [A] 4,5,10 * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 4; figure 6 * |