EP1175838 - Agent for increasing density for aromatic oil and beverage and beverage concentrate produced therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nutrinova Nutrition Specialties & Food Ingredients GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states Nutrinova Nutrition Specialties & Food Ingredients GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merkt, Gerhard Johannesallee 14 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
Jager, Martin, Dr. Am Bannzaun 11 67294 Gauersheim / DE | 03 /
Von Rymon Lipinski, Gert-Wolfhard, Prof. Dr. Schlesienstrasse 62 65824 Schwalbach / DE | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/36] | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | Schweitzer, Klaus, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek Industriepark Kalle-Albert Gebäude H391 Rheingaustrasse 190 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116735.0 | 19.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | DE2000137256 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10037256 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175838 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175838 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/226, A23L2/385, A23L2/52 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
A23L2/385 (EP,US);
A23L2/44 (KR);
A23L2/56 (EP,US);
A23L2/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Title | German: | Beschwerungsmittel für Aromaöle und damit hergestellte Getränkekonzentrate und Getränke | [2002/05] | English: | Agent for increasing density for aromatic oil and beverage and beverage concentrate produced therewith | [2002/05] | French: | Agent pour augmenter la densité des huiles aromatiques et boissons et concentrés de boissons obtenus par cet agent | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/02] | 08.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5235746B ; | [X]JPH11178551 ; | [X]JPH09187249 ; | [X]JPH07107927 ; | [A]JPH07115901 ; | JPH11178551 [ ]; | JPH09187249 [ ]; | JPH07107927 [ ]; | [A]GB1118019 (CO RO AS); | [X]US4705691 (KUPPER PHILIP L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-13 * column 4, line 7 - line 20; claims 1-12 * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 39 *; | [A]EP0925727 (QUEST INT [NL]); | [A]US6086938 (SLOOT ENGELBERTUS ALBERTUS [NL], et al); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 40, Database accession no. 1977-71929y, XP002192858 & JPS5235746B B2 00000000 (KAO SOAP CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6,9-13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11178551 A 19990706 (TAKASAGO INTERNATL CORP) [X] 1,3-6,9-13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09187249 A 19970722 (T HASEGAWA CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 07, & JP07107927 A 19950425 (T HASEGAWA CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 27, Database accession no. 1995-202767, XP002192863 & JPH07115901 A 00000000 (HASEGAWA CO. LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 37, Database accession no. 1999-437289, & JPH11178551 A 00000000 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 39, Database accession no. 1997-419376, & JPH09187249 A 00000000 (HASEGAWA) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 25, Database accession no. 1995-190128, & JPH07107927 A 00000000 (HASEGAWA) [ ] * abstract * |