EP1174617 - Hydrostatic axial piston machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr Machines Bulle SA Rue de L'Industrie 19 1630 Bulle / CH | [2002/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riedhammer, Josef Panoramastrasse 43 72160 Horb am Neckar / DE | 02 /
Eckhardt, Erich Les Jorettes 1642 Sorens / CH | 03 /
Schwede, Franz-Josef Ryf 65 3280 Murten / CH | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Thoma, Michael Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117151.9 | 13.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE2000134857 | 18.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10034857 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1174617 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1174617 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174617 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/20 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
F04B1/2042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/05] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hydrostatische Axialkolbenmaschine | [2002/04] | English: | Hydrostatic axial piston machine | [2002/04] | French: | Machine hydrostatique à pistons axiaux | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5634776 (LEEMHUIS RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 16 - column 1, line 67; figures 1,2,5-9 * * column 5, line 8 - column 5, line 59 * * column 6, line 24 - column 6, line 45 * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]GB1367512 (CITROEN SA) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, column 2, line 101 - page 4, column 1, line 24; figures 3,4,7 *; | [Y]US3180274 (SISK FRANCIS J) [Y] 3,4 * column 3, line 71 - column 8, line 30; figures 1,3,4 *; | [YA]US5555726 (HUEBNER ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 9 * abstract * [A] 1-13; | [Y]EP0953767 (MANNESMANN REXROTH AG [DE]) [Y] 2-9 * figures 1-5; claim - *; | [A]US5572919 (ISHIZAKI NAOKI [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 14 - column 1, line 51; figure - *; | [A]EP1013928 (PARKER HANNIFIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |