EP1279357 - Change aids for external articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Jörg Alte Haingasse 15 61184 Karben / DE | 02 /
Westerheide, Lars Gundelhardtstrasse 35 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Mattias Charlotte-Rosenthal-Strasse 21 65510 Idstein / DE | 04 /
Kline, Mark James 6318 Alert New London Road Okeana, OH 45053 / US | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | McGregor, Judit Ester Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | McGregor, Judit Ester Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | McGregor, Judit Ester Procter & Gamble Service GmbH 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2003/29] | McGregor, Judit Ester Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65924 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2003/05] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H., et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117671.6 | 26.07.2001 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279357 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279357 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47D5/00, A61F13/15 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
A47D15/003 (EP,US);
A47D5/006 (EP,US);
A61F13/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/05] | Title | German: | Hilfsvorrichtung zum Auswechseln externer Artikel | [2003/05] | English: | Change aids for external articles | [2003/05] | French: | Dispositif pour faciliter l'échange des objets externes | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2005 | BE | 14.09.2005 | CH | 14.09.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | IT | 14.09.2005 | LI | 14.09.2005 | NL | 14.09.2005 | TR | 14.09.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | SE | 14.12.2005 | ES | 25.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IT | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
IT | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
SE | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2989753 (MARIA BURNER LILY) [A] 1-20 * column 1, lines 67-70 ** column 2, lines 42-46 *; | [X]US3367334 (TESTA SAMUEL R) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12,16,18 * column 3, lines 7-21 *; | [X]US3973567 (SRINIVASAN SUBRAMANIAN, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12,16,18 * column 5, lines 15-36; figure 3 *; | [X]US4964859 (FELDMAN RUTH L [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-13,15-20 * column 3, lines 30-43; claims 8,9 *; | [A]US5304158 (WEBB JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, lines 46-68 *; | [X]GB2298627 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12,16,18 * pages 1-57 *; | [X]US5706950 (HOUGHTON DAWN LYNN ILNICKI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-20 * column 5, lines 37-46 * * column 6, lines 49-55 * * column 8, lines 28-65 * * column 9, lines 10-47 * * column 10, lines 44-55 *; | [X]US6036679 (BALZAR TAMMY JO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12,16,18 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 29 * | Examination | EP1051934 | WO0149151 | WO0160214 |