EP1178473 - Optical pickup apparatus and tilt amount detecting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagisawa, Takuma Corp. R&D Lab., Pioneer Corporation, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 02 /
Araki, Yoshitsugu Corp. R&D Lab., Pioneer Corporation, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 03 /
Maeda, Takanori Corp. R&D Lab., Pioneer Corporation, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 04 /
Iwasaki, Masayuki Corp. R&D Lab., Pioneer Corporation, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/06] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117757.3 | 31.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000237691 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000237691 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178473 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178473 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/095 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
G11B7/131 (EP,US);
G11B7/095 (KR);
G11B7/0956 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/07] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Abtastgerät und Verfahren zur Messung einer Neigung | [2002/06] | English: | Optical pickup apparatus and tilt amount detecting method | [2002/06] | French: | Appareil de lecture optique et procédé pour mesurer une inclinaison | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4525826 (NAKAMURA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-11,16,18-22 * the whole document * [A] 2,7,8,12-15,17; | [XA]US5523989 (ISHIBASHI HIROMICHI [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,9-11,16,18-22 * the whole document * [A] 2,7,8,12-15,17; | [XA]US5553052 (OONO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-11,16,18-22 * the whole document * [A] 2,7,8,12-15,17; | [A]EP0749116 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US5671208 (PARK BYEONG-HO [KR]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0944052 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,9-11,16,18-22 * the whole document * [A] 2,7,8,12-15,17; | [XA]EP0953974 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,9-11,16,18-22 * the whole document * [A] 2,7,8,12-15,17 |