EP1176289 - Emission control system of internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Daisuke, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Matsushita, Souichi, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Tsukasaki, Yukihiro, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Matsuoka, Hiroki, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
Hayashi, Kotaro, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
Ishiyama, Shinobu, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
Ohtsubo, Yasuhiko, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 08 /
Magarida, Naofumi, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 09 /
Kobayashi, Masaaki, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 10 /
Negami, Akihiko, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 11 /
Oda, Tomihisa, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 12 /
Harada, Yasuo, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 13 /
Ono, Tomoyuki, c/oToyota Jidosha K. K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117845.6 | 23.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000223051 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000223051 | JP20010212889 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001212889 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176289 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176289 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176289 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F02D41/02, B01D53/94, F01N3/36 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
F01N3/208 (EP);
F01N3/08 (KR);
F01N3/0814 (EP);
F01N3/0871 (EP);
F01N2610/03 (EP);
F02B29/0406 (EP);
F02B37/00 (EP);
F02M26/05 (EP);
F02M26/10 (EP);
F02M26/23 (EP);
F02M26/33 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F02D41/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/02] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Abgasemissions-Steuerungssystem für Verbrennungsmotoren | [2002/05] | English: | Emission control system of internal combustion engine | [2002/05] | French: | Système de commande de l'émission des gaz d'échappement pour moteurs à combustion interne | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06212961 ; | [A]JPH05263624 ; | [A]JPH08260947 ; | [A]DE19639172 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,12* column 2, line 1 - line 62; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0896136 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * column 11, line 17 - column 12, line 26; figures 1,5 *; | [X]EP0990788 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * column 6, line 10 - line 25 * * column 11, line 35 - line 55 * * column 17, line 27 - line 38 * * column 27, line 32 - column 28, line 3; figures 11,12A,12B * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941107), vol. 018, no. 579, Database accession no. (M - 1698), & JP06212961 A 19940802 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,12,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940117), vol. 018, no. 027, Database accession no. (M - 1543), & JP05263624 A 19931012 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-22 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08260947 A 19961008 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |