EP1280138 - Method for audio signals analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brainstream Audio Ltd. c/o King Loose St John's House 5 South Parade Summertown Oxford OX2 7JL / GB | [2007/22] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Empire Interactive Europe Ltd. 677 High Road London N12 0DA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tell, Andreas Wiesenstr. 25 78462 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
Throll, Bernhard Brüder-Grimm-Str. 23 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117957.9 | 24.07.2001 | [2003/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1280138 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02, G10L11/00 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G10L25/48 (EP,US);
G10L19/02 (EP,US);
G10L25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Analyse von Audiosignalen | [2003/05] | English: | Method for audio signals analysis | [2003/05] | French: | Procédé d'analyse de signaux audio | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2008 | 31.07.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - HAMDY K N ET AL, "Time-scale modification of audio signals with combined harmonic and wavelet representations", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), ISBN 0-8186-7919-0, pages 439 - 442, XP010226229 [A] 1,21,25-33 * paragraph [03.3] * * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.599669 | [AD] - GROSSBERG S, "Pitch Based Streaming in Auditory Perception", TECHNICAL REPORT CAS/CNS-TR-96-007, Boston University MA, (199602), XP002187320 [AD] 1,21,25-33 * Absatz "A Neural Model of Pitch Perception and Auditory Streaming" * |