EP1279774 - Method for managing cascade waves in sewer networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weikopf, Manfred Leydelstrasse 95 47802 Krefeld / DE | [2009/19] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Weikopf, Manfred Rosenhain 17 D-47804 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/05] | Application number, filing date | 01118077.5 | 26.07.2001 | [2003/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279774 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E03F9/00, E03F3/02 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
E03F3/02 (EP);
E03F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/42] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kaskaden-Schwall-Bewirtschaftung von Kanalisationsnetzen | [2003/05] | English: | Method for managing cascade waves in sewer networks | [2003/05] | French: | Méthode pour la gestion de vagues de cascade en des réseaux de canalisations | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/50] | Public notification(s) | Feststellung eines Rechtsverlusts nach Regel 112(1) EPÜ | Weikopf, Manfred Leydelstrasse 95 47802 Krefeld / DE | [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 17.08.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2004 | 31.07.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2005 | 31.07.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.07.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29903265U (LIEBAU LOTHAR [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1132533 (LIEBAU LOTHAR [DE]) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0658657 (STEINHARDT LOTHAR [DE]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [A] - DAUER L, "STEINKA - STUFENENTWASSERUNG MIT EINFACHEM KANALBAU EIN KOSTENGUNSTIGES ENTWURFSKONZEPT FUR SCHMUTZWASSERENTSORGUNGS- NETZE IM LANDLICHEN BEREICH UND IM AUSSENBEREICH VON STADTEN", KORRESPONDENZ ABWASSER, ABWASSERTECHNISCHE VEREINIGUNG, ST. AUGUSTIN, DE, (19941201), vol. 41, no. 12, ISSN 0341-1540, pages 2196 - 2201, XP000482352 [A] 5 * page 2197, column L, line 31 - line 42 * | by applicant | DE3616418 | EP0918113 |