EP1176249 - Papermakers forming fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEAVEXX CORPORATION 11120 Capital Boulevard Wake Forest, NC 27588 / US | [2002/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, Robert G. 4512 Burlingtom Mills Road Wake Forest, North Carolina 27587 / US | 02 /
Ward, Kevin John 1476 Meghan Drive Coldbrook, Nova Scotia / CA | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118176.5 | 26.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | US20000628668 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: US 628668 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176249 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176249 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
D21F1/0045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/35] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Papiermacher Formiergewebe | [2002/05] | English: | Papermakers forming fabric | [2002/05] | French: | Toile de formage pour papéterie | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 05.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 26.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: designation fee not paid in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5101866 (QUIGLEY SCOTT D [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,15,16,19-22 * column W *; | [XA]AT395441B (HUTTER & SCHRANTZ AG [AT]) [X] 1,2,7,9,19 * the whole document * [A] 12,18,22; | [XA]US5487414 (KUJI TAKEHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,19-21 * figures 2A,5A * [A] 12,16,18,22; | [X]EP0708200 (ALBANY INT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12,15,16,19,22 * figures 5,6 *; | [XA]US5555917 (QUIGLEY SCOTT [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,19-21 * figure 7 * [A] 12,16,22; | [A]US5829489 (KUJI TAKEHITO [JP]) [A] 12* column W * |