EP1180357 - Process for treating human hair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2003/12] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states GOLDWELL GmbH Postfach 64280 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fath, Bettina Kapellenweg 18 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Dubowoj, Polina, Aree PLace Condominium Room 801 59/178 Suhkumvit Soi 26, Sukhumvit Road Klongton, Klongtoey, Bangkok 10110 / TH | [2002/08] | Application number, filing date | 01118398.5 | 28.07.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | DE2000140513 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10040513 | [2002/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1180357 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1180357 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
A61K8/416 (EP);
A61K8/88 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/30] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Behandeln von menschlichen Haaren | [2002/08] | English: | Process for treating human hair | [2002/08] | French: | Procédé pour traiter les cheveux humains | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9534271 (WELLA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * Beispiele 1-3, Seiten 17-22 *; | [E]EP1188431 (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-5 * example 7 *; | [A]US5824296 (DUBIEF CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] * Spalte 3, Zeilen 35-38; Beispiele 3,6 *; | [A]US5804205 (EPSTEIN HOWARD [US], et al) [A] * Beispiel * |