EP1180527 - Cationic polymer dispersion for paper sizing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2004/01] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauschel, Bernd, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 30 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Buchholz, Vera, Dr. Genovevastrasse 5 51063 Köln / DE | 03 /
Thiele, Bernd Brombeerweg 4 51519 Odenthal / DE | 04 /
Kijlstra, Johan, Dr. Odenthaler Markweg 48 b 51467 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2002/08] | Application number, filing date | 01118704.4 | 03.08.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | DE2000139747 | 16.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10039747 | DE2000146770 | 21.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10046770 | [2002/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180527 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180527 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/28, C08F257/02, D21H21/16 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
D21H21/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F257/02 (EP,US);
D21H17/455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/08] | Title | German: | Kationische Polymerdispersionen zur Papierleimung | [2002/08] | English: | Cationic polymer dispersion for paper sizing | [2002/08] | French: | Dispersion de polymère cationique pour le collage du papier | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 22.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 06.04.2005 | TR | 06.04.2005 | DK | 06.07.2005 | GR | 06.07.2005 | SE | 06.07.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | LU | 03.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 08.09.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | IE | 06.04.2005 | |
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
CY | 03.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | IE | 06.04.2005 | |
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | IE | 06.04.2005 | |
TR | 06.04.2005 | ||
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | IE | 06.04.2005 | |
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | IE | 06.04.2005 | |
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | IE | 06.04.2005 | |
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | IE | 06.04.2005 | |
DK | 06.07.2005 | ||
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | DK | 06.07.2005 | |
GR | 06.07.2005 | ||
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
PT | 08.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | DK | 06.07.2005 | |
SE | 06.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 06.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2454397 (BASF AG) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0051144 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4379869 (SIADAT BAHRAM, et al) [A] 1* claims 1,15 * |