EP1190810 - Method of manufacturing a piston [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Nürnberg GmbH Nopitschstrasse 67 90441 Nürnberg / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otte, Bernhard, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Hubertusstrasse 8 90513 Zirndorf / DE | 02 /
Konrad, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Zechenring 30 91257 Pegnitz / DE | 03 /
Wallmann, Clemens Am Röthelheim 57 91052 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Waldmann, Hans Werner Theodor-Von-Zahn-Strasse 19 91052 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Bergmann, Hans Wilhelm, Prof. Dr. Heidegasse 3a 95494 Gesees / DE | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118791.1 | 09.08.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000145174 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045174 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190810 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190810 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/10 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
B23P15/10 (EP,US);
F02F3/00 (EP,US);
F16J1/00 (EP,US);
F16J9/00 (EP,US);
F16J9/22 (EP,US);
B23K2101/003 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
F16C2360/22 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49249 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/51] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kolbens | [2002/13] | English: | Method of manufacturing a piston | [2002/13] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un piston | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3014771 (NICHOLS WILLIAM M) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 5 - line 35; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP0820831 (KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19833827 (MAN B & W DIESEL AG [DE]) [DA] 3 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 14 *; | [A]US4233490 (SHALAI ALEXANDR N, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |