EP1285590 - Lipid blends [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. P.O.Box 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Decombaz, Jacques Chemin du Chermiaux 20 1806 St-Legier / CH | 02 /
Mace, Catherine Grand-Rue 33 1095 Lutry / CH | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119155.8 | 08.08.2001 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285590 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A61K31/19 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/201 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/201, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | Lipidmischungen | [2003/09] | English: | Lipid blends | [2003/09] | French: | Mélanges de lipides | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 03.10.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6228367 (WATSON TOMMY STANLEY [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [X] - SOUCI, S.W. (EDITIOR), Food composition and nutrition tables, STUTTGART, WISSENSCHAFTLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, (1986), XP002188744 [X] 2-10 * ISBN 3-8047-0833-1; page 160 * | [A] - BARRE D EDWARD, "Potential of evening primrose, borage, black currant, and fungal oils in human health.", ANNALS OF NUTRITION & METABOLISM, (200103), vol. 45, no. 2, ISSN 0250-6807, pages 47 - 57, XP001027476 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000046706 | [A] - DECOMBAZ J ET AL, "Effect of diet on the replenishment of intramyocellular lipids after exercise.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (200012), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 1436-6207, pages 244 - 247, XP001027317 [A] 1-10 * page 245, lines 9-15 * |