EP1180607 - Clamping element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RK Rose + Krieger GmbH & Co. KG Verbindungs- und Positioniersysteme Potsdamer Strasse 9 D-32423 Minden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states RK Rose + Krieger GmbH & Co. KG Verbindungs- und Positioniersysteme Potsdamer Strasse 9 D-32423 Minden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schunke, Kurt Petershäger Weg 12 32427 Minden / DE | 02 /
Buchholz, Bernd Bössel 7 32369 Rahden / DE | 03 /
Lampert, Rolf Südbahnstrasse 49 32584 Löhne / DE | 04 /
Neubaur, Michael Klosterstrasse 17 31655 Stadthagen / DE | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119214.3 | 09.08.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | DE2000213949U | 12.08.2000 Original published format: DE 20013949 U | [2002/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180607 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180607 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/14, F16B7/04, F16B2/02 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
F16B7/1418 (EP);
F16B2/02 (EP);
F16B7/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/45] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Klemmstück | [2002/08] | English: | Clamping element | [2002/08] | French: | Pièce de serrage | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 21.08.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 31.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.09.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.09.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXA]US6155743 (CHEN ERH-CHIANG [TW]) [PX] 1-5,12 * figures 2,4,5 * * claim 1 * [A] 6-11; | [YA]US4111575 (HOSHINO MASAO) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * * column 4, line 40 - line 66 * [A] 5-12; | [A]US4497092 (HOSHINO YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-4,9,11,12 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 32 - line 61 *; | [Y]DE29822310U (ROSE & KRIEGER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4639979 (POLSON GARY R [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 33 - line 53 * |