EP1284409 - Method and apparatus for the inspection of the deformation of objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mähner, Bernward Auenstrasse 3a 82275 Emmering / DE | [2003/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119568.2 | 16.08.2001 | [2003/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284409 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/16, G01M17/02 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
G01B11/167 (EP);
G01B11/161 (EP);
G01M17/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung der Verformung von Prüfobjekten | [2003/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for the inspection of the deformation of objects | [2003/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'inspection de la déformation d'objets | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 20.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/34] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19509962 (UNIV KARLSRUHE [DE]) [X] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1061332 (BANDAG INC [US]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4231578 (NOVA C O R D AG VADUZ [LI]) [AD] 1-34 * abstract *; | [AD]US5786533 (NEWMAN JOHN W [US]) [AD] 1-34 * abstract *; | [E]DE10009870 (MAEHNER BERNWARD [DE]) [E] 1-34 * the whole document * |