EP1182070 - Multipart closure element and manufacturing method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor GmbH Albert-Einstein-Strasse 14 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [2002/32] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Meritor Automotive GmbH Hanauer Landstrasse 338 60314 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Horst Offenbacher Landstrassee 537 60599 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Grimm, Rainer Sachsenhäuser Landwehrweg 225 60599 Frankfurt / DE | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/20] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al König-Palgen-Schumacher-Kluin Patentanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119594.8 | 16.08.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | DE20001040701 | 17.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10040701 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182070 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182070 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/04 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
B60J7/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Title | German: | Mehrteiliges Verschlusselement und Herstellungsverfahren | [2002/09] | English: | Multipart closure element and manufacturing method therefor | [2002/09] | French: | Elément de fermeture en plusieurs parties et procédé de fabrication | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2007 | 22.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/32] | 02.04.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5658042 (RUEHRINGER ERICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5727839 (RUEHRINGER ERICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 39; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19708369 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |