EP1191144 - Curtain coating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernert, Richard Ebertstrasse 48 89537 Giengen / DE | 02 /
Ueberschär, Manfred Kiefernweg 3 89547 Gerstetten / DE | [2002/13] | Application number, filing date | 01119808.2 | 16.08.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000147167 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10047167 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191144 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191144 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/48 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
B05C5/005 (EP,US);
D21H23/48 (EP,US);
Y10S118/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, SE [2002/51] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorhang-Auftragsvorrichtung | [2002/13] | English: | Curtain coating apparatus | [2002/13] | French: | Appareil d'enduction du rideau | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 19.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2001087694 ; | [AD]WO9848113 (JAGENBERG PAPIERTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * figures 4-7 *; | [AD]WO9847630 (BACHOFEN & MEIER AG MASCHF [CH], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9909253 (JAGENBERG PAPIERTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19* the whole document *; | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 33, Database accession no. 2001-314590, XP002179456 & JP2001087694 A 20010403 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [PX] 1-3,5,6,9-11,19 * abstract * |