EP1182686 - Method of hot switching a plasma tuner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eni Technology, Inc. 100 Highpower Road Rochester, NY 14623-3498 / US | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harnett, Sean O. 50 Brooktree Drive Penfield, New York 14526 / US | 02 /
Brounley, Richard W. 3144 Timberview Drive Dunedin, Florida 34698 / US | 03 /
Church, Richard E. 160 Danforth Crescent Rochester, New York 14618 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Neumann, Ernst Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119867.8 | 16.08.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | US20000640426 | 17.08.2000 Original published format: US 640426 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182686 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
H01J37/32082 (EP,US);
H01J37/32183 (EP,US);
H05H1/36 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Warmschaltung eines Plasmatuners | [2002/09] | English: | Method of hot switching a plasma tuner | [2002/09] | French: | Procédé de commutation à chaud d'un tuner à plasma | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |