EP1182514 - Toner compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation, Patent Department Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciccarelli, Roger N. 145 Hibiscus Drive Rochester, New York 14618 / US | 02 /
Bayley, Denise R. 2172 Carter Road Fairport, New York 14450 / US | 03 /
Pickering, Thomas R. 436 Thrushwood Lane Webster, New York 14580 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119930.4 | 17.08.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | US20000643244 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: US 643244 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182514 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182514 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/097 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
G03G9/09716 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/39] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tonerzusammensetzung | [2002/09] | English: | Toner compositions | [2002/09] | French: | Composition de toner | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 20.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/08] | Divisional application(s) | EP05002396.9 / EP1544685 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0980030 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8* page 4, line 31 - line 33; examples 7,8; claims 1,2,6 * |