EP1188673 - Machine and method for transferring foldable material blanks from a transfer station to a processing station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOPACK Verpackungstechnik GmbH Grabauer Strasse 49 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE | [2002/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinke, Karsten Rudolf-Virchow-Strasse 47 23879 Mölln / DE | 02 /
Riedel, Claus Korachstrasse 53 21031 Hamburg / DE | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Seemann, Ralph, et al Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Seemann, Ralph, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte, Niedmers & Seemann, Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119974.2 | 18.08.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | DE2000146121 | 15.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10046121 | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188673 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/20 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
B65B19/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Überführen von faltbaren Materialzuschnitten von einer Übergabestation zu einer Bearbeitungsstation | [2002/12] | English: | Machine and method for transferring foldable material blanks from a transfer station to a processing station | [2002/12] | French: | Machine et procédé pour transférer des ébauches pliables d' une station de transfert vers une station de traitement | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 28.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4612756 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * column 3, line 13 - column 7, line 63; figure - *; | [X]US5113638 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12 * column 3, line 9 - column 8, line 64; figure - *; | [A]US5461842 (BRIZZI MARCO [IT], et al); | [A]EP1035021 (GD SPA [IT]) | by applicant | DE19703069 | DE19944812 |