EP1180906 - Mobile communication system and method of matching current location information for a mobile station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murai, Kiyokazu, NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120015.1 | 20.08.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | JP20000248576 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000248576 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1180906 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1180906 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180906 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04L12/56 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04W8/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W8/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/08] | H04Q7/38, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/07] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mobilkommunikationssystem und Verfahren zur Standortsregistrierung einer Mobilstation | [2002/08] | English: | Mobile communication system and method of matching current location information for a mobile station | [2002/08] | French: | Système de communication mobile et procédé pour la régistration de la position d'une station mobile | [2005/44] |
Former [2002/08] | Système de communication mobile et procédé pour régistration la position pour une station mobile | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9916266 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 24 * * page 6, line 14 - line 26 * * page 18, line 27 - line 24 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO9917459 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5793762 (PENNERS JOHN HENRY HUBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column A * * column 5, line 24 - column 8, line 8 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0002406 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 23 * * figure 1 * | [A] - KUMAR A ET AL, "A new matching algorithm for managing location information in mobile computing", PERFORMANCE, COMPUTING, AND COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2000. IPCCC '00. CONFERENCE PROCEEDING OF THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL PHOENIX, AZ, USA 20-22 FEB. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000220), ISBN 0-7803-5979-8, pages 231 - 239, XP010500030 [A] 1-6 * paragraphs 1. to 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCCC.2000.830323 |