EP1193884 - Intrinsically safe field bus system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesr. Deutschland, vertr. d. d. Bundesministerium für Wirtschaft und Techn., vert. D. den Präs. der Physi.Tech. Bundesansta Bundesallee 100 38116 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Bundesr. Deutschland, vertr. d. d. Bundesministerium für Wirtschaft und Techn., vert. d. den Präs. der Physi.Tech. Bundesansta Bundesallee 100 38116 Braunschweig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerlach, Udo, Dr. Pastor-Hayder-Weg 6 38176 Wendeburg / DE | 02 /
Uehlken, Thomas Dormstrasse 7 38154 Königslutter/Gross Steinum / DE | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Gerstein, Hans Joachim, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Hauss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Gerstein, Hans Joachim, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120055.7 | 21.08.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | DE2000149233 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10049233 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193884 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193884 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00, H04L12/00 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
H02H11/00 (EP);
H02H9/008 (EP);
H04B3/546 (EP);
G05B9/00 (EP);
H02H9/00 (EP);
H04B2203/5458 (EP);
H04B2203/5483 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] | Title | German: | Eigensicheres Feldbussystem | [2002/14] | English: | Intrinsically safe field bus system | [2002/14] | French: | Bus de secteur à sécurite intrinsèque | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2710752 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * claims 1-4,6,7 *; | [A]EP0347569 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE3821181 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US5589813 (NIELSEN OLE C [DK]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |