EP1184396 - (Meth)acrylate ester-based resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2006/05] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kazuhiko 6-2-2-415, Kushiro Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-0024 / JP | 02 /
Yokota, Yoshiyuki 25-18-201, Kamiyamate-cho Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0841 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Kunio 5-1-101, Nishimachi Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0865 / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Masaya 4-723-1, Honmachi, Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1114 / JP | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120148.0 | 22.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | JP20000261763 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000261763 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1184396 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1184396 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, C09D133/06 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
C08F20/18 (EP,US);
C07C69/54 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2002/48] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mischungen auf Basis von (Meth)acrylat-Harzen | [2002/10] | English: | (Meth)acrylate ester-based resin composition | [2002/10] | French: | Compositions à base de résines de (méth)acrylates | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 20.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5413544 ; | [XA]JPH06122734 ; | [XA]JPH06313088 ; | [A]US4594448 (HOHAGE HEINZ-JUEERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-8* claim 4 *; | [XA]US5492944 (ELSER WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1 * example 1; claim 1 * [A] 2-8 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790329), vol. 003, no. 037, Database accession no. (C - 041), & JP54013544 A 19790201 (SONY CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-8 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940804), vol. 018, no. 415, Database accession no. (C - 1233), & JP06122734 A 19940506 (HOECHST GOSEI KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-8 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06313088 A 19941108 (SK KAKEN CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-8 |