EP1191728 - Method for compensating channel quality differences in a WDM system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krummrich, Peter, Dr. Halskestrasse 16 81379 München / DE | 02 /
Mayer, Albrecht Greinerberg 15A 81371 München / DE | 03 /
Neuhauser, Richard, Dr. Lochhamer Strasse 80 81477 München / DE | [2002/13] | Application number, filing date | 01120263.7 | 23.08.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000147342 | 25.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10047342 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191728 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/08 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
H04B10/077 (EP,US);
H04B10/07955 (EP,US);
H04J14/0221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausgleich von Kanalqualitätsunterschieden in einem WDM-System | [2002/13] | English: | Method for compensating channel quality differences in a WDM system | [2002/13] | French: | Procédé pour la compensation des différences de qualité de canal dans un système de multiplexage en longueur d'onde | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 07.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |