EP1288360 - Method of forming stitch loops extending over several needles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | [2007/43] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states H. Stoll GmbH & Co. Stollweg 1 72760 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoll, Thomas Dipl.-Ing Memmingerstrasse 7 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Daniela Patentanwältin Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwältin, Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120463.3 | 28.08.2001 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1288360 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288360 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D04B1/22 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
D04B1/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2003/48] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildung von sich über mehrere Nadeln erstreckenden Maschen | [2003/10] | English: | Method of forming stitch loops extending over several needles | [2003/10] | French: | Procédé pour la réalisation des mailles s'étendant sur plusieurs aiguilles | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 06.09.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 09.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5367892 (SHIMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 37-61; figures 6,7 * * column 8, line 63 - column 10, line 27; figures 10-17 *; | [A]EP0638678 (SHIMA SEIKI MFG [JP]) [A] 1* column 5, lines 8-45; figures 3,6,9; claim 2 *; | [A]US6116057 (ROELL FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 45-54 * * column 4, lines 4-29; figure 1 * |