EP1193555 - Negative resist composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uenishi, Kazuya Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120664.6 | 31.08.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000263815 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000263815 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193555 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/004, G03F7/038 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/004 (KR);
G03F7/0047 (KR);
G03F7/0048 (EP,US);
G03F7/0382 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE [2003/01] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Negativ arbeitende Resistzusammensetzung | [2002/14] | English: | Negative resist composition | [2002/14] | French: | Composition pour réserve de type négatif | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/04] | 13.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5340697 (YOSHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* column 16, line 50 - line 57 *; | [X]EP0634696 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,7-10,19 * page 12, line 1 - line 2 * * page 15; example 3; tables 1-1 *; | [X]DE4435791 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8-10 * claim 1 *; | [XP]EP1117002 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,3-10,19 * page 79, line 39 * | Examination | WO0048044 | EP1087260 |