EP1188674 - Method and apparatus for checking articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Czarnotta, Michael Christian-Seebade-Strasse 59 28279 Bremen / DE | 03 /
Below, Dietrich Steinfeld 19 27412 Bülstedt / DE | [2002/22] |
Former [2002/12] | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | ||
02 /
Czarnotta, Michael Anna-Seghers-Strasse 109 28279 Bremen / DE | |||
03 /
Below, Dietrich Steinfeld 19 27412 Bülstedt / DE | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120858.4 | 30.08.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | DE2000146401 | 18.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10046401 | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188674 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188674 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/28 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
B65B19/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/50] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Üperprüfen von Gegenständen | [2002/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for checking articles | [2002/12] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour vérifier des objets | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 18.10.2006 | ES | 29.01.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | ES | 29.01.2007 | |
FR | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 29.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4972494 (WHITE KENNETH W [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 7, line 43 - column 16, line 64; figure - * * column 21, line 7 - line 48 * [Y] 7,10,12; | [A]EP0854090 (FOCKE & CO [DE]); | [A]US5877506 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al); | [Y]EP0902275 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 57; figure -; claim 5 *; | [A]DE19839852 (FOCKE & CO [DE]); | [YA]WO0022826 (PHILIP MORRIS INC [US]) [Y] 10,12 * page 3, line 21 - page 7, line 11; figure - * [A] 2,3,9 | by applicant | DE19647670 | DE19904671 |