EP1193090 - Stop buffer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schelling, Jan Vesouler Strasse 9 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
Steffens, Ewald Keltenstrasse 22 71272 Renningen / DE | [2002/14] | Application number, filing date | 01121123.2 | 04.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | DE2000148236 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10048236 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193090 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193090 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193090 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/10, F16F1/373, F16F15/08, F16F1/44, E05F5/02 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
F16F15/08 (EP);
E05F5/022 (EP);
F16F1/373 (EP);
F16F1/44 (EP);
E05Y2900/536 (EP);
E05Y2900/546 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | B60J5/10, F16F1/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/30] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anschlagpuffer | [2002/14] | English: | Stop buffer | [2002/14] | French: | Tampon de butée | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 24.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Request for further processing for: | 13.04.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 13.04.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5482348 (MASS NOAH B [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,9,10,17,20 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5735511 (STOECKER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7,9,10,17 * column 1, line 52 - column 5, line 12; figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP0892140 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,10,17 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 49; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0943773 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,9,10,17* column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 29; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | DE19520492 |