EP1188721 - Process and device for water treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Würdig, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Hunsrückstrasse 10 13086 Berlin / DE | [2002/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Würdig, Uwe Dipl.-Ing. Hunsrückstrasse 10 13086 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Herrmann, Frank Peter-Huchel-Str. 38 12619 Berlin / DE | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Erich, Dieter Patentanwälte Erich & Nern August-Bebel-Ring 36 15751 Niederlehme / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Erich, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Patentanwälte Erich & Nern August-Bebel-Ring 36 15751 Niederlehme / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121246.1 | 05.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | DE2000144697 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044697 | DE2000144698 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044698 | DE2000144696 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044696 | DE2000215594U | 08.09.2000 Original published format: DE 20015594 U | DE2000215618U | 08.09.2000 Original published format: DE 20015618 U | DE2000215591U | 08.09.2000 Original published format: DE 20015591 U | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188721 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/06, C02F3/26 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
C02F3/1294 (EP);
C02F1/645 (EP);
C02F1/72 (EP);
C02F3/06 (EP);
C02F3/26 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/50] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufbereiten von Wasser sowie Einrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2002/12] | English: | Process and device for water treatment | [2002/12] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement de l'eau | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3937593 (HANERT, HANS ET AL.) [X] 1,2,9 * column 1, lines 3-5; figure 1 * * column 1, lines 59-67; figure 5 * * column 2, line 53 - line 67 * * column 4, line 5 - line 59 *; | [X]DE3524364 (LINDE AG [DE]) [X] 6-9 * column 3, line 32 - line 60 * * column 4, line 27 - line 63 * * column 5, line 47 - line 66 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO9519937 (NILSSON BROR [SE]) [X] 2,9 * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US3649533 (REIJONEN YRJO JOHANNES, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 32 - line 66 * * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US5234632 (SCHMIDT HANS [DE]) [X] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19509253 (BIOTEC UMWELT ANALYTIK BERATUN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19602571 (SUEDSACHSEN WASSER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2141119 (CULLIGAN INT CO) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |