EP1187025 - Cache update method and cache update control system employing non-blocking type cache [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashiroya, Atsushi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121260.2 | 05.09.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | JP20000272859 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000272859 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1187025 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1187025 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
G06F12/0859 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/40] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Cachespeicheraktualisierungsverfahren und Cachespeicheraktualisierungssteuersystem mit einem nicht-blockierenden Typ von Cachespeicher | [2002/11] | English: | Cache update method and cache update control system employing non-blocking type cache | [2002/11] | French: | Procédé de mis à jour d'antémémoire et système de commande de mis à jour d'antémemoire utilisant une antémemoire de type non-bloquant | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5680572 (AKKARY HAITHAM [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 35 * * column 5, line 48 - column 10, line 15 * * column 10, line 52 - column 13, line 8 *; | [X]US5826109 (ABRAMSON JEFFERY M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 9 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 5 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 14 * * column 10, line 44 - line 67 * * column 11, line 6 - line 47 * * column 12, line 59 - column 13, line 6 * * column 18, line 15 - line 54 * * column 24, line 54 - column 25, line 7 * * column 25, line 27 - line 59 * * column 26, line 1 - line 35 * * column 27, line 7 - line 61 *; | [X] - KROFT D, "LOCKUP-FREE INSTRUCTION FETCH/PREFETCH CACHE ORGANIZATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE. MINNEAPOLIS, MAY 12 - 14, 1981, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, LONG BEACH, IEEE, US, (19810512), vol. SYMP. 8, pages 81 - 87, XP000212046 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - BELAYNEH S ET AL, "A DISCUSSION ON NON-BLOCKING/LOCKUP-FREE CACHES", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE NEWS, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, US, (19960601), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0163-5964, pages 18 - 25, XP000641020 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/381718.381727 |