EP1191172 - Motor vehicle door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft Kettwiger Strasse 12-24 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft Kettwiger Strasse 12-24 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reddmann Uwe Danziger Strasse 24 45145 Essen / DE | [2002/40] |
Former [2002/13] | 01 /
Reddmann Uwe Schwanenbuschstr. 113 45138 Essen / DE | Representative(s) | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, Dr., et al Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Patentanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121315.4 | 06.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE20002016292U | 20.09.2000 Original published format: DE 20016292 U | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191172 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191172 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/32, E05B65/12 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
E05B81/14 (EP);
E05B81/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | E05B65/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugtürverschluss | [2002/13] | English: | Motor vehicle door lock | [2002/13] | French: | Serrure pour une porte de véhicule automobile | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 05.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 20.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/31] | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5020838 (FUKUMOTO RYOICHI [JP]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE29813797U (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4395064 (BELLOT DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 16; figure . *; | [A]DE19700887 (EWALD WITTE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3150621 (KIEKERT GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5020838 | DE19537045 | DE29813797U |