EP1186777 - Control valve for variable displacement type compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ota, Masaki c/o K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Hirose, Tatsuya c/o K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Kazuya c/o K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Suitou, Ken c/o K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Umemura, Satoshi c/o K.K. Toyota Jidoshokki, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121365.9 | 06.09.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | JP20000273823 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000273823 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186777 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186777 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] |
Former [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1186777 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2004/01] | |||
[2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/18 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/41] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kontrollventil für einen variablen Verdrängungskompressor | [2002/11] | English: | Control valve for variable displacement type compressor | [2002/11] | French: | Soupape de régulation d'un compresseur à capacité variable | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/20] | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5205718 (FUJISAWA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [Y]EP1026398 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [A]EP0255764 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DA]JPH06341378 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06341378 A 19941213 (TGK CO LTD) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06341378 |