EP1202283 - MRAM memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qimonda AG Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 212 81739 München / DE | [2007/01] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viehmann, Hans-Heinrich 8 E Chelsea Ridge Drive Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Müller . Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121390.7 | 06.09.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | DE20001050365 | 11.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10050365 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1202283 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1202283 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1202283 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/16 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
G11C11/16 (EP,US);
G11C11/15 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/03] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MRAM-Anordnung | [2002/18] | English: | MRAM memory device | [2002/18] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire MRAM | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 13.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 02.05.2007 | IT | 02.05.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/10] | IE | 02.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US6490217 (DEBROSSE JOHN KENNETH [US], et al) [E] 1 * column 9, line 5 - column 9, line 35 * * column 10, line 20 - column 10, line 56 *; | [E]US6462980 (SCHUSTER-WOLDAN HANS [DE], et al) [E] 1 * column 4, line 44 - column 4, line 63 * * column 5, line 24 - column 5, line 32 * |