EP1191010 - Production of adamantanediols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/49] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. No. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakuda, Minoru, c/oMitsubishi Gas Chemic. Co. Inc. Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Onozawa, Takashi, c/oMitsubishi Gas Chem. Co. Inc. Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Kurata, Hiroshi, c/oMitsubishi Gas Chemi. Co. Inc. Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Furukawa, Kikuo, c/oMitsubishi Gas Chemi. Co. Inc. Corporate Research Laboratory, 22, Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2002/13] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121405.3 | 07.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | JP20000289427 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000289427 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191010 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191010 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191010 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/48 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C07C29/48 (EP,US);
C07C2603/74 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/48, C07C35/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/41] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Adamantandiolen | [2002/13] | English: | Production of adamantanediols | [2002/13] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'adamantandioles | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP1026140 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DX] 1-8 * column 2, line 53 - line 58 * * column 3, line 10 - line 49 * * column 4, line 21 - line 46 * * example - *; | [A] - BRESSAN M ET AL, "Selective oxidation of alkanes and ethers mediated by ruthenium(II) complexes", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1989), vol. 7, ISSN 0022-4936, pages 421 - 423, XP002137291 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39890000421 |