EP1209369 - Locking means and locking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245 8047 Zürich / CH | [2005/45] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Bellerivestrasse 36 8008 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertsch, Rainer Augustastrasse 73 76437 Rastatt / DE | 02 /
Weber, Bruno Pappelweg 30 75334 Straubenhardt / DE | [2002/22] | Representative(s) | Weise, Wolfgang Siemens Schweiz AG Intellectual Property Department Zug Gubelstrasse 22 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Weise, Wolfgang Siemens Schweiz AG Intellectual Property Department Zug Gubelstrasse 22 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2002/22] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121520.9 | 08.09.2001 | [2002/22] | Priority number, date | DE2000158462 | 24.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10058462 | [2002/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1209369 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1209369 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/18, H05K7/14 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H02B1/44 (EP);
F16B2/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/08] |
Former [2002/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verriegelungselement und Verriegelungsvorrichtung | [2002/22] | English: | Locking means and locking device | [2002/22] | French: | Elément de verrouillage et dispositif de verrouillage | [2002/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | IE | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | TR | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | AT | 08.09.2006 | LU | 08.09.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
AT | 08.09.2006 | ||
LU | 08.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
AT | 08.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
IE | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2345855 (ROBERT DETZER FA) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XA]DE3213405 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,7-10; | [A]US4472917 (ALDERTON GORDON H S [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |