EP1199156 - Composite components made of sintered expanded resin and method for producing such components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alessio S.r.l. Via Grumello, 32 24127 Bergamo / IT | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alessio, Gianni Franco Via Leonardo Da Vinci 26 24030 Presezzo (Bergamo) / IT | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/17] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01121706.4 | 17.09.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI02231 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: IT MI002231 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199156 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/32, E04B1/80, E04C2/20 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B32B5/32 (EP);
B29C44/06 (EP);
E04B1/80 (EP);
E04C2/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Extension states | SI | 27.09.2002 | Title | German: | Verbundmaterialien aus gesinterten, geschäumten Polymeren und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2002/17] | English: | Composite components made of sintered expanded resin and method for producing such components | [2002/17] | French: | Matériaux composés à base de résine expansée et agglomérée ainsi que la méthode pour leur production | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 18.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Request for further processing for: | 12.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005 | 30.09.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2007 | 30.09.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2722811 (RECTICEL [FR]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3755063 (MASSEY D, et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 20 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 8 * * table EXAMPLES *; | [A]US5882776 (BAMBARA JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 * * column 5, lines 15-26 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 18 * * example - * * claims 1-3,8 *; | [A]JPH02277623 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910130), vol. 015, no. 039, Database accession no. (M - 1075), & JP02277623 A 19901114 (ACHILLES CORP) [A] 1,2,4,5,8 * abstract * |