EP1188467 - Liquid filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/06] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaehler, Juergen Calle Ajalvir 6/3 28663 Cobena / ES | [2002/12] | Application number, filing date | 01121811.2 | 11.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | DE2000145217 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045217 | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188467 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188467 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/06, B01D29/07, B01D39/00 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
B01D25/001 (EP);
B01D25/24 (EP);
B01D39/1623 (EP);
B01D2239/0622 (EP);
B01D2239/065 (EP);
B01D2239/0695 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D25/001, B01D25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsfilter | [2002/12] | English: | Liquid filter | [2002/12] | French: | Filtre pour liquide | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 04.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.02.2006 | FI | 08.02.2006 | GB | 08.02.2006 | IE | 08.02.2006 | NL | 08.02.2006 | TR | 08.02.2006 | DK | 08.05.2006 | SE | 08.05.2006 | GR | 09.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | AT | 11.09.2006 | LU | 11.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
TR | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
AT | 11.09.2006 | ||
LU | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
AT | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
AT | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
GB | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
IE | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE2039482 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5427597 (OSENDORF RICHARD J [US]) [DY] 1-11 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 37 *; | [Y]DE29814830U (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [Y] 1-11* page 3 - page 7; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]EP0893151 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * column 1, line 26 - line 44 * * column 4, line 11 - line 52 * |