EP1191289 - Household electrical appliance with a hinge provided with a passage for electric cables or tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/13] | For a household electrical appliance, a hinge provided with a passage for electric cables or tubes | ||
[2009/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | ||
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maritan, Marco, c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept., V. le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | 02 /
Bianchi, Carlo, c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept., V. le G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio / IT | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 01121913.6 | 12.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI00540 | 26.09.2000 Original published format: IT MI000540 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191289 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191289 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191289 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02, E05D11/00, A47L15/42, // F24D15/02 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
A47L15/4261 (EP);
A47L15/4274 (EP);
E05D11/0081 (EP);
E05D5/065 (EP);
F25D23/028 (EP);
E05Y2800/10 (EP);
E05Y2900/20 (EP);
E05Y2900/31 (EP);
F25D2323/024 (EP);
F25D2400/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/30] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrisches Haushaltsgerät mit ein Scharnier mit einer Durchführung für elektrische Kabel oder Rohre | [2009/06] | English: | Household electrical appliance with a hinge provided with a passage for electric cables or tubes | [2009/06] | French: | Appareil électroménager avec une charniére pourvue d'un passage pour des câbles électriques ou de tubes | [2009/06] |
Former [2002/13] | Für ein elektrisches Haushaltsgerät, ein Scharnier mit einer Durchführung für elektrische Kabel oder Rohre | ||
Former [2002/13] | For a household electrical appliance, a hinge provided with a passage for electric cables or tubes | ||
Former [2002/13] | Pour un appareil électroménager, une charniére pourvue d'un passage pour des câbles électriques ou de tubes | Examination procedure | 02.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.06.2009 | GB | 17.09.2009 | ES | 28.09.2009 | FR | 30.09.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/01] | GB | 17.09.2009 | |
ES | 28.09.2009 | ||
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | ES | 28.09.2009 | |
FR | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | ES | 28.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4912942 (KATTERHENRY GLENN E [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 45 * * claims 1,4,5,9,10,14 * * figures 2-7 *; | [A]DE4122541 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 44 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR1456916 (WHIRLPOOL CO) [A] 1-3 * page 1, column R, line 30 - line 38 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5787724 (POHL DOUGLAS A [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]GB2252789 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 3-9,12,13,20,21 *; | [A]US5941619 (STIEBEN WILLIAM V [US], et al) [A] * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 55 * * figures 1,9,10 *; | [A]US3788094 (BENASUTTI L, et al) [A] * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 28 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE7604352U (BAYERISCH MOTOREN WERKE AG) [A] * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2551459 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] * figures 1-3 * |