EP1193098 - Sealing system for a support lever on an openable vehicle roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2007/48] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Webasto Vehicle Systems International GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohout, Erwin Stiftsbogen 160 81375 München / DE | 02 /
Dittrich, Wolfgang Flurgrenzstrasse 32 82205 Gilching / DE | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Wiese, Gerhard Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Wiese, Gerhard Wiese & Konnerth Georgenstrasse 6 82152 Planegg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122070.4 | 14.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | DE2000148990 | 27.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10048990 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193098 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193098 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193098 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60J10/12, B60J7/043 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
B60J7/0435 (EP,US);
B60J10/82 (EP,US);
B60J10/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/31] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dichtungssystem für einen Stützhebel an einem öffnungsfähigen Fahrzeugdach | [2002/14] | English: | Sealing system for a support lever on an openable vehicle roof | [2002/14] | French: | Système d'étanchéité pour un levier de support dans un toit ouvrant de véhicule | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 24.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.2008 | [2009/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1519762 (TIMMERMAN MAURICE GASTON GEORG) [A] 1 * column 2; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3920909 (FARMONT PRODUKTION [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO9712775 (BAEDJE K H METEOR GUMMIWERKE [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]DE19713347 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | DE19713347 |