EP1195114 - Furniture glider [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VS Vereinigte Spezialmöbelfabriken GmbH & Co. KG Hochhäuser Strasse 8 97941 Tauberbischofsheim / DE | [2007/13] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states VS Vereinigte Spezialmöbelfabriken GmbH & Co. Hochhäuser Strasse 8 D-97941 Tauberbischofsheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Korte, Friedrich Huckenstrasse 30 32429 Minden / DE | 02 /
Weber, Reinhard Engelbertstrasse 4 32425 Minden / DE | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/14] | Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian, et al Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian Patentanwaltskanzlei Söltenfuss Zweibrückenstrasse 6 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/15] | Schöndorf, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner, Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122407.8 | 20.09.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | DE2000149294 | 04.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10049294 | [2002/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195114 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195114 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47B91/06, A47C7/00 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
A47C7/002 (EP);
A47B91/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/15] | Title | German: | Möbelgleiter | [2002/15] | English: | Furniture glider | [2002/15] | French: | Patin de meuble | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | IT | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2014/20] |
Former [2014/03] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 20.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CA2109408 (DUMAS MARTIN [CA]) [X] 1-4 * page 5, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * [Y] 5-7; | [A]FR2763816 (REYNAUD NICOLAS [FR]) [A] 1-4 * figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US5191676 (GERNER JAMES L [US]) [Y] 5,6 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, paragraph 1; figures 3,5 * * column 3, paragraph 2 *; | [YA]EP0279055 (VER SPEZIALMOEBEL VERWALT [DE]) [Y] 7 * column 8, line 35 - line 44; figure 1 * [A] 8 | by applicant | CA2109408 | FR2763816 |