EP1191821 - Organic electroluminescent element and organic electroluminescent material used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/22] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Noriko Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 02 /
Matsuura, Mitsunori Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 03 /
Kita, Hiroshi Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122501.8 | 21.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | JP20000290466 | 25.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000290466 | JP20000385286 | 19.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000385286 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1191821 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191821 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14, C09K11/06 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
H10K2102/103 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/324 (EP,US);
H10K85/622 (EP,US);
H10K85/626 (EP,US);
H10K85/654 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | H05B33/14, C09K11/06, H01L51/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/51] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Organisches Elektrolumineszenzelement und dafür verwendetes organisches Elektrolumineszenzmaterial | [2002/13] | English: | Organic electroluminescent element and organic electroluminescent material used therefor | [2002/13] | French: | Element électroluminescent organique et matériau électroluminescent utilisé pour sa préparation | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.09.2009 | [2011/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1154280 ; | [X]EP0765106 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]); | [X]EP0797375 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [X]EP0825804 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [X]EP0866110 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]); | [X]EP0929104 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0964459 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]US6022998 (KAWAGUCHI HIROFUMI [JP], et al); | [X]EP1013740 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) |