EP1195653 - Intermediate transfer member having a stiffening layer and method of using [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states NexPress Solutions LLC 1447 St. Paul Street Rochester, NY 14653-7103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlebois, Robert 81 West Avenue Hilton, New York 14468 / US | 02 /
Chowdry, Arun 6 Trotters Field Run Pittsfrod, New York 14534 / US | 03 /
Cody, Craig M. 4599 River Road Scottsvill, New York 14546 / US | 04 /
Gomes, Earl G. 24 Carthage Drive Rochester, New York 14621 / US | 05 /
Grabb, Dennis 7011 Sodus Center Road Sodus, New York 14551-9551 / US | 06 /
Herrick, Diane M. 245 Melrose Street Rochester, New York 14619 / US | 07 /
Patteson, Bonnie 100 Radnor Lane Rochester, New York 14617 / US | 08 /
Pavlisko, Joseph A. 433 West Bloomfield Road Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | 09 /
Smith, Dean R. 5760 West Lake Road Conesus, New York 14435 / US | 10 /
Stack, Kenneth D. 17 Wenlock Road Fairport, New York 14450 / US | 11 /
Tan, Biao 520 East Avenue Rochester, New York 14607 / US | 12 /
Tombs, Thomas N. 5578 Lake Road South Brockport, New York 14420 / US | [2002/16] |
Former [2002/15] | 01 /
Charlebois, Robert 81 West Avenue Hilton, New York 14468 / US | ||
02 /
Chowdry, Arun 6 Trotters Field Run Pittsfrod, New York 14534 / US | |||
03 /
Cody, Craig M. 92-1 Robert Quigley Drive Scottsvill, New York 14546 / US | |||
04 /
Gomes, Earl G. 24 Carthage Drive Rochester, New York 14621 / US | |||
05 /
Grabb, Dennis 7011 Sodus Center Road Sodus, New York 14551-9551 / US | |||
06 /
Herrick, Diane M. 245 Melrose Street Rochester, New York 14619 / US | |||
07 /
Patteson, Bonnie 100 Radnor Lane Rochester, New York 14617 / US | |||
08 /
Pavlisko, Joseph A. 433 West Bloomfield Road Pittsford, New York 14534 / US | |||
09 /
Smith, Dean R. 5760 West Lake Road Conesus, New York 14435 / US | |||
10 /
Stack, Kenneth D. 17 Wenlock Road Fairport, New York 14450 / US | |||
11 /
Tan, Biao 520 East Avenue Rochester, New York 14607 / US | |||
12 /
Tombs, Thomas N. 5578 Lake Road South Brockport, New York 14420 / US | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/52] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/15] | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122522.4 | 24.09.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | US20000679113 | 04.10.2000 Original published format: US 679113 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1195653 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1195653 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
G03G15/162 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0119 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2010/13] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zwischenübertragungselement mit Versteifungsschicht und zugehöriges Verwendungsverfahren | [2002/15] | English: | Intermediate transfer member having a stiffening layer and method of using | [2002/15] | French: | Elément de transfert intermédiaire avec une couche de raidissement et méthode de son utilisation | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/05] | 23.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5555185 (LANDA BENZION [CA]) [Y] 3 * column 6, line 25 - line 39 * [A] 10; | [A]US5689787 (TOMBS THOMAS N [US], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 4; example 1 *; | [XAY]JPH1138779 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [X] 1,4-5,9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0010] , [0011] , [0015] , [0018] , [0025]; figure 2 * [A] 10 [Y] 2-3,6-8; | [XDAY]US6075965 (TOMBS THOMAS N [US], et al) [XD] 1-2,4-5,9 * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 13; figures 4-9 * [A] 10 [Y] 2-3,6-8 | by applicant | US5187526 | US5555185 | US5689787 | US5701567 | US5715505 | US5828931 | JPH1138779 | US6075965 | US19990457455 |