EP1216771 - Inserted core for producing a casting mould and process for the production of such casting mould [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 71287 Weissach / DE | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Ralph Bruckner Strasse 15 71686 Remseck / DE | 02 /
Thiele, Frank Anne Frank Strasse 2 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2002/26] | Application number, filing date | 01122817.8 | 22.09.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | DE20001059083 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10059083 | [2002/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1216771 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1216771 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1216771 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/00 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
B22C9/10 (EP);
B22C1/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/26] | B22C9/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/24] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Einlegekern zur Herstellung einer Gussform sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Gussform | [2002/26] | English: | Inserted core for producing a casting mould and process for the production of such casting mould | [2002/26] | French: | Noyau inséré pour la fabrication d'un moule de fonderie et procédé pour la fabrication d'un tel moule de fonderie | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 02.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2209622 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1-6 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]DE2450013 (CSEPELI FEMMUE) [X] 1-6 * claims 1-3 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]DE608751 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [X] 1-6 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0914886 (FISCHER GEORG FAHRZEUGTECH [CH]) [X] 1-6 * page 2; claims 1-10 * * examples 1,2 *; | [X]JPH1029035 ; | [X]EP0945200 (WAGNER HEINRICH SINTO MASCH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0882568 (HOECHSMANN RAINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0968776 (EOS ELECTRO OPTICAL SYST [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10029035 A 19980203 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * examples 1,2 * |