EP1193827 - Rotor structure for permanent-magnet motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimada, Munekatsu 3-22-14, Minamino Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ono, Hideaki 4-12-6, Hongoudai, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Oowada, Yuu 1-6-1-905, Shioiri-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Kikuchi, Toshio 5-4-1-508, Sahara Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122884.8 | 24.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000296377 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000296377 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193827 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193827 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193827 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/30, H02K1/27 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
H02K1/30 (EP,US);
H02K1/276 (EP,US);
H02K2201/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/17] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Läuferaufbau für Dauermagnetmotor | [2002/14] | English: | Rotor structure for permanent-magnet motor | [2002/14] | French: | Structure rotorique pour moteur à aimant permanent | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 01.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000184638 ; | [YA]US6047460 (NAGATE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,9 * abstract * * column 9, line 20 - column 10, line 6 * * column 10, line 7 - column 12, line 67; figures 2,4 * [A] 1,7; | [A]US5829120 (UCHIDA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 15 - line 65; figures 1A,1B,3A,3B * * column 9, line 23 - line 28 *; | [A]US4506181 (JONES DONALD W [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5 * column 4, line 1 - line 5; figure 5 *; | [A]US5363937 (JAMES M ELMER [US]) [A] 2 * column 6, line 27 - line 31; figures 6,7 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000184638 A 20000630 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 6,9 |