EP1181902 - A flexible expandable stent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDINOL LTD. P.O. Box 58165, Kiryat Atidim, Bldg. 3, 4th Fl. Tel Aviv 61581 / IL | [2009/13] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Medinol Ltd. P.O. Box 58165, Kiryat Atidim, Bldg. 3, 4th Fl. Tel Aviv 61581 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Israel, Henry M. 39 Ben Zakai Street Bnei Brak / IL | 02 /
Pinchasik, Gregory 6/143 Tsamarot Street 46424 Herzelia / IL | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | KUHNEN & WACKER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Postfach 19 64 85319 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123201.4 | 26.07.1995 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | US19940282181 | 28.07.1994 Original published format: US 282181 | US19950457354 | 31.05.1995 Original published format: US 457354 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1181902 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1181902 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181902 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1181902 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/856 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91541 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2230/0013 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Title | German: | Flexibler expandierbarer Stent | [2002/09] | English: | A flexible expandable stent | [2002/09] | French: | Stent dilatable flexible | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 01.10.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2003 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Observations by third parties | 22.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95929314.3 / EP0762856 | EP98101293.3 / EP0846449 | Divisional application(s) | EP04026188.5 / EP1602343 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
22.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 02
11.10.2005
29.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | 03
07.10.2005
21.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al, et al Brevalex 22, Avenue du Doyen Louis Weil 38024 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | 04
12.10.2005
16.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
22.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
11.10.2005
29.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | |||
03
07.10.2005
21.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al, et al Brevalex 22, avenue du Doyen Louis Weil B.P. 1506 F-38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | |||
04
12.10.2005
16.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2008/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
22.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
11.10.2005
29.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
03
07.10.2005
21.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al, et al Brevalex 22, avenue du Doyen Louis Weil B.P. 1506 F-38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | |||
04
12.10.2005
16.05.2008
WITHDRAWN Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2008/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
22.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
11.10.2005
29.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
03
07.10.2005
21.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al, et al Brevalex 22, avenue du Doyen Louis Weil B.P. 1506 F-38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | |||
04
12.10.2005
10.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2007/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
22.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
11.10.2005
03.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
03
07.10.2005
21.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al, et al Brevalex 22, avenue du Doyen Louis Weil B.P. 1506 F-38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | |||
04
12.10.2005
10.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2007/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
03.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
11.10.2005
03.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
03
07.10.2005
21.06.2007
WITHDRAWN Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al, et al Brevalex 22, avenue du Doyen Louis Weil B.P. 1506 F-38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | |||
04
12.10.2005
10.11.2005
ADMISSIBLE Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2005/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
11.10.2005
Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
03
07.10.2005
WITHDRAWN Conor Medsystems, Inc. 1003 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US Opponent's representative Moutard, Pascal Jean, et al, et al Brevalex 22, avenue du Doyen Louis Weil B.P. 1506 F-38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | |||
04
12.10.2005
WITHDRAWN Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP Opponent's representative Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | |||
Former [2005/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
11.10.2005
Cordis B.V. Oosteinde 8 9301 LJ RODEN / NL Opponent's representative Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [2005/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2005
WITHDRAWN Cordis Medizinische Apparate GmbH Elisabeth Selbert-str.4a 40764 Langenfeld / DE Opponent's representative Ahme, Johannes, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | 16.11.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.03.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.06.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.07.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.02.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2005 | BE | 12.01.2005 | CH | 12.01.2005 | GR | 12.01.2005 | LI | 12.01.2005 | DK | 12.04.2005 | ES | 23.04.2005 | PT | 12.06.2005 | LU | 26.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | SE | 27.07.2006 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/03] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
PT | 12.06.2005 | ||
LU | 26.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
LU | 26.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
SE | 27.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | ||
CH | 12.01.2005 | ||
LI | 12.01.2005 | ||
DK | 12.04.2005 | ||
ES | 23.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 12.01.2005 | |
BE | 12.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0335341 (EXPANDABLE GRAFTS PARTNERSHIP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0566807 (SGRO JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) | by applicant | US4762128 | US4886062 | US4950227 | US4969458 | US5019090 | US5102417 | US5161547 | US5314472 | other | EP0762856 |