EP1193076 - Ink-jet recording apparatus with print head gap and pressing force adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2008/25] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimomura, Masaki Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Asawa, Hiroshi Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 03 /
Isono, Masahiro Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Yoichi Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 05 /
Hashiuchi, Koji Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 06 /
Tajima, Hiroyuki Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 07 /
Ishihara, Kenjiro Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123248.5 | 02.10.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000306632 | 02.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000306632 | JP20000306638 | 02.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000306638 | JP20000327013 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000327013 | JP20010266045 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001266045 | JP20010266046 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001266046 | JP20010299469 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001299469 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193076 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193076 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193076 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/308, B41J25/312, B41J19/14 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
B41J25/3082 (EP,US);
B41J19/145 (EP,US);
B41J25/308 (EP,US);
B41J25/312 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | B41J25/308, B41J25/312 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucker mit Druckspalt- und Anpresskraftanpassung | [2002/14] | English: | Ink-jet recording apparatus with print head gap and pressing force adjustment | [2002/14] | French: | Appareil d'impression à jet d'encre avec adaption de l'espacement entre la tête d'impression et le cylindre d'appui et avec adaption de la force d'appui | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 06.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05007527.4 / EP1566277 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2008 | BE | 18.06.2008 | CY | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | FI | 18.06.2008 | IT | 18.06.2008 | NL | 18.06.2008 | TR | 18.06.2008 | SE | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | ES | 29.09.2008 | GB | 02.10.2008 | IE | 02.10.2008 | LU | 02.10.2008 | CH | 31.10.2008 | FR | 31.10.2008 | LI | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | PT | 18.11.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CY | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
TR | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
GB | 02.10.2008 | ||
IE | 02.10.2008 | ||
LU | 02.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CY | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
GB | 02.10.2008 | ||
IE | 02.10.2008 | ||
LU | 02.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
GB | 02.10.2008 | ||
IE | 02.10.2008 | ||
LU | 02.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
GB | 02.10.2008 | ||
IE | 02.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.10.2008 | ||
CH | 31.10.2008 | ||
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
LI | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
IE | 02.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS63144063 ; | [A]JP2000198552 ; | [A]JPH0292667 ; | [A]US5129748 (BRANDON JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 51-54 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0895869 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 14-18 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] *; | [A]US5961224 (BAITZ GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 3, lines 26-49 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 12; figure 1 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881024), vol. 012, no. 400, Database accession no. (M - 756), & JP63144063 A 19880616 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-13,15-18 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000198552 A 20000718 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900622), vol. 014, no. 291, Database accession no. (M - 0989), & JP02092667 A 19900403 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 14-18 * abstract * |