EP1197613 - Movable scaffolding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.M.S. S.R.L. Via Altivole, 17 31031 Caerano di San Marco (Treviso) / IT | [2002/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sartor, Fiorenzo Via San Rocco, 10 31041 Cornuda / IT | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/16] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01123330.1 | 08.10.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | IT2000PD00237 | 12.10.2000 Original published format: IT PD000237 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197613 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197613 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/15, E04G1/20, B66F11/04 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
E04G1/20 (EP);
E04G1/15 (EP);
E04G2001/157 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/16] | E04G1/15, E04G1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/16] | Title | German: | Bewegbares Gerüst | [2002/16] | English: | Movable scaffolding | [2002/16] | French: | Echafaudage mobile | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 03.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/45] | 07.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3541018 (LEYENDECKER GERD DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 42 - line 45 * * column 3, line 53 - line 61 * * column 3, line 61 - line 63 * * claim 7 * * figures 1,9A,9B,11,14,18 *; | [X]FR2482995 (PIAT IMPALCATURE AUTOMATICHE S [IT]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 7 - page 10, line 22 * * figures 1,2,18,19 *; | [X]US4809814 (ST-GERMAIN JEAN [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 46 - line 56 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US4157129 (CHRISTOPHER GORDON W [US]) [A] 4 * figures 2-4 * |