EP1283417 - Method and apparatus for inspecting an object, especially luggage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Heimann GmbH Im Herzen 4 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2004/02] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states Heimann Systems GmbH Im Herzen 4 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aust, Stefan Am Schäferberg 51 65527 Niedernhausen / DE | 02 /
Meder, Claus Robert-Koch-Strasse 22 64380 Rossdorf / DE | 03 /
Koch, Cornelius Am Bittelborn 15 65239 Hochheim / DE | [2003/07] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas, et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [2013/32] |
Former [2008/28] | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/07] | Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Patentassessor, Rheinmetall, Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123419.2 | 28.09.2001 | [2003/07] | Priority number, date | DE20011039672 | 11.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139672 | [2003/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1283417 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1283417 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1283417 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/04, G01V5/00 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G01V5/22 (EP,US);
G01N23/044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/07] | G01N23/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2003/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Inspektion eines Objektes, insbesondere eines Gepäckstückes | [2003/07] | English: | Method and apparatus for inspecting an object, especially luggage | [2003/07] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour l'inspection d'un object, spécialement d'un bagage | [2003/07] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | AT | 28.09.2018 | IE | 28.09.2018 | LU | 28.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/10] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 28.09.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | DK | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | ES | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19749783 (PFEILER MANFRED DR ING [DE]) [X] 1-23* the whole document * |