EP1195515 - Fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stier, Hubert Lindenweg 11 71679 Asperg / DE | 02 /
Heyse, Joerg Elser-Ring 22 74354 Besigheim / DE | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Körfer, Thomas, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123487.9 | 28.09.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | DE2000149033 | 04.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10049033 | [2002/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1195515 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1195515 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/18, F02M61/16 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
F02M61/1806 (EP);
F02M51/0671 (EP);
F02M61/12 (EP);
F02M61/162 (EP);
F02M61/168 (EP);
F02M61/1833 (EP);
F02M61/1853 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/03] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffeinspritzventil | [2002/15] | English: | Fuel injector | [2002/15] | French: | Injecteur de carburant | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE972387 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 69; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE3121572 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,8 * abstract *; | [A]FR2773852 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 3,4,8,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9953191 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,6,11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19815789 |