EP1211848 - Method for establishing a connection in telecommunication networks with DSL technology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2002/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandt, Thoralf Dorfstrasse, 8c 06901 Rackith / DE | 02 /
Kunze, Rüdiger Charlottenstrasse,16 13156 Berlin / DE | [2002/23] | Application number, filing date | 01123532.2 | 29.09.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | DE2000160452 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10060452 | [2002/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1211848 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1211848 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1211848 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
H04L61/45 (EP);
H04L61/00 (EP);
H04L67/53 (EP);
H04L67/55 (EP);
H04L2101/622 (EP);
H04L63/08 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/23] | H04L12/28, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren für den Verbindungsaufbau in Telekommunikationsnetzen mit DSL-Technologien | [2002/23] | English: | Method for establishing a connection in telecommunication networks with DSL technology | [2002/23] | French: | Procédé d'établissement d'appel aux réseaux de télécommunication avec technologie DSL | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | IE | 15.02.2006 | IT | 15.02.2006 | NL | 15.02.2006 | TR | 15.02.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | SE | 15.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | ES | 26.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | AT | 29.09.2006 | LU | 29.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
TR | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
AT | 29.09.2006 | ||
LU | 29.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
AT | 29.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
AT | 29.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
IE | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5802304 (STONE JEREMY DANIEL [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1 - column 4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6012086 (LOWELL RICHARD W [US]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO0016529 (ADWISE LTD [IL]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 3 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO0044149 (3COM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 3 * * figure 1 * |